Accounts and annual returns STONY STRATFORD LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 285949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1036 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 15 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required