Financial history THE BRADFORD-ON-AVON CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 286068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £100.99k £105.79k £123.30k £120.55k £102.50k
Total expenditure £98.97k £114.46k £121.06k £115.73k £93.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A