2ND YEOVIL (ST MICHAELS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 286297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.50k £9.80k £3.67k £4.37k £3.36k
Total expenditure £6.30k £4.20k £7.29k £4.24k £1.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A