MAYVILLE HIGH SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 286347
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Hardie Trustee 05 December 2018
HAVANT LIGHT OPERA Received: On time
John William Deibel Trustee 24 June 2020
COCKLESHELL COMMUNITY SPORTS CLUB LIMITED Received: On time
Vanda Skonieczna Trustee 01 June 2014 None on record
Sarah Hookway Trustee 01 January 2022 None on record
Rev Anthony Christopher Rustell Trustee 01 September 2021 None on record
John Ashley Davenport Trustee 01 January 2022 None on record
Tanya Riordan Trustee 05 December 2018 None on record
Andrew James Porter Trustee 01 September 2021 None on record