Financial history THE BERNARD GOLD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 286349
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £15.31k £15.19k £15.17k £15.49k £13.27k
Total expenditure £34.01k £25.37k £13.87k £9.06k £27.75k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A