Accounts and annual returns WOMENS PLAYHOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 286384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window