THE WILDLIFE HOSPITAL TRUST

Charity number: 286447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £2.00m £2.16m £2.31m £2.99m £2.54m
Total expenditure £1.46m £1.59m £1.63m £1.62m £1.69m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.72m £1.81m £1.95m £2.58m £2.07m
Income - Other trading activities £116.61k £120.30k £132.03k £160.42k £155.60k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £120.65k £145.39k £157.83k £171.35k £202.88k
Income - Other £51.58k £80.61k £66.40k £83.63k £111.42k
Income - Legacies £1.36m £1.34m £1.55m £2.15m £1.61m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.25m £1.37m £1.40m £1.38m £1.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £216.08k £219.08k £231.45k £239.90k £238.33k
Expenditure - Governance £181.27k £224.91k £246.66k £254.50k £267.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £35.01k £28.03k £33.33k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0