Financial history FOREST OF DEAN UNIT NO 586 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 286701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £22.78k £36.41k £59.58k £21.09k £38.50k
Total expenditure £24.02k £33.59k £52.59k £22.29k £21.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.60k