Trustees FOREST OF DEAN UNIT NO 586 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 286701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carol Tiley MBE Chair
AXBRIDGE & CHEDDAR SEA CADETS (TS GOATHLAND)
Received: On time
Sophie Jones Trustee 27 October 2021
None on record
Kay Warner Trustee 27 October 2021
None on record
Michael Chard Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Toni Salmon Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Graeme Terrell Trustee 28 July 2017
None on record
Nicola Terrell Trustee 28 June 2017
None on record