THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S BROUGHTON WITH ST JAMES BOSSINGTON

Charity number: 286718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 July 2017 On time Download