Financial history THE MEAPA

Charity number: 286732
Charity reporting is overdue by 216 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £379.16k £392.56k £408.00k £429.41k £330.73k
Total expenditure £245.53k £264.30k £389.27k £394.57k £433.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £75.29k