Financial history THE ADDLESHAW GODDARD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 286887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £31.73k £213.43k £153.75k £60.04k £76.97k
Total expenditure £74.40k £89.44k £101.66k £27.59k £91.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A