ISLAMIC ACADEMY

Charity number: 287003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £17.34k £15.82k £8.54k £13.40k £21.15k
Total expenditure £19.06k £16.48k £9.68k £6.38k £25.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A