DAVID PEARLMAN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 287009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £531.89k £943.66k £649.03k £948.07k £632.27k
Total expenditure £583.72k £665.88k £566.56k £602.87k £762.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £313.91k £637.62k £350.25k £625.00k £312.50k
Income - Other trading activities £34.84k £46.51k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £183.14k £259.54k £298.78k £323.07k £319.77k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £541.53k £560.24k £518.65k £573.72k £698.40k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £105.64k £47.92k £29.15k £64.43k
Expenditure - Governance £10.40k £13.18k £9.96k £8.80k £11.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £541.53k £547.05k £508.69k £564.92k £686.63k
Expenditure - Investment management £22.97k £86.79k £47.92k £29.15k £64.43k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0