CHALFORDS LIMITED

Charity number: 287322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £3.25m £3.83m £3.53m £3.46m £4.28m
Total expenditure £3.98m £5.51m £4.62m £2.61m £3.07m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £6.50k £10.00k £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £1.21m £1.21m £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.04m £2.61m £3.52m £3.45m £4.28m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.68m £3.03m £2.83m £1.23m £1.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £2.49m £1.79m £1.38m £1.35m
Expenditure - Governance £114.11k £145.25k £52.43k £0 £69.67k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.50m £2.88m £2.71m £0 £1.60m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.22m £1.53m £1.79m £1.38m £1.35m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0