Accounts and annual returns ST CHRISTOPHER SCHOOL PARENTS' CIRCLE

Charity number: 287455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 26 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 25 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 25 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 23 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 04 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required