GREENWICH HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 287541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required