GREENWICH HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 287541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.72k £2.82k £3.05k £3.30k £3.34k
Total expenditure £318 £1.85k £2.14k £2.29k £1.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A