Dogfen lywodraethu THE CHRISTIAN CHILDREN'S FUND OF GREAT BRITAIN
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH JULY 1983 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED ON 7TH DECEMBER 1988 AND 29 APRIL 1997 & 18TH DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 OCT 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO RELIEVE CHILD POVERTY AND HARDSHIP ANYWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND TO PROMOTE THE CARE, DEVELOPMENT OR EDUCATION OF NEEDY CHILDREN, ANYWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR RELIGION, SEX OR RACE OR NATIONAL ORIGIN FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING FOR THE HEALTHY GROWTH, DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OTHERWISE LACKING BASIC NECESSITIES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD AND THE UNITED NATIONS DECLARATION ON THE RIGHTS OF TH CHILD (1959) AND TO PROMOTE AND OBSERVANCE OF THAT CONVENTION AND DECLARATION. (2) THE FURTHERANCE OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH RELIEVE OR COMBAT MALNUTRITION, HUNGER, DISEASE, SICKNESS, POVERTY OR DISTRESS ANYWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, (3) AND SUBJECT THERETO TO CARRY ON SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS THE COMPANY MAY DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.