Financial history BARNET MARK MASTER MASONS NUMBER 947 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 287651
Charity reporting is overdue by 387 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.30k £1.30k £195 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.80k £1.80k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A