Trustees WESSEX ARCHAEOLOGY LIMITED

Charity number: 287786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr IAN SELBY Chair 10 January 2012
None on record
Sarah Louise Urquhart Voaden Trustee 10 February 2017
None on record
Parvis Homayounfar Jamieson Trustee 10 February 2017
WILTSHIRE CITIZENS ADVICE
Received: On time
Dr Rowan Whimster Trustee 22 April 2016
None on record
MR Chris Watson Trustee 13 December 2013
None on record
Nichola Johnson Trustee 13 December 2013
BRANTWOOD (JOHN RUSKIN MEMORIAL TRUST)
Received: On time
THE GUILD OF ST GEORGE
Received: On time
ROSEMARY KAREN VERONICA COOK Trustee 17 September 2013
None on record
CHRISTOPHER MARK BRAYNE Trustee 13 December 2012
None on record