Financial history THE COUNCIL FOR BRITISH ARCHAEOLOGY

Charity number: 287815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £762.66k £676.96k £751.72k £553.61k £941.42k
Total expenditure £733.97k £750.24k £707.59k £662.92k £795.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.90k £13.61k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £257.76k £249.88k £51.31k £38.74k £59.98k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £500.13k £423.41k £696.59k £511.99k £882.43k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.76k £3.67k £3.83k £2.88k £1
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £17.30k £3.46k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £727.35k £733.73k £706.56k £658.93k £795.43k
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.62k £16.51k £1.03k £4.00k £412
Expenditure - Governance £6.50k £14.28k £6.44k £0 £6.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0