Financial history THE NANCY BATEMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 288015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £1.04k £1.17k £1.66k £566 £1.68k
Total expenditure £9.27k £32.89k £20.40k £21.43k £20.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A