HANLEY CROUCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 288337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 February 2017 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 10 February 2017 10 days late Download