HANLEY CROUCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 288337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £225.15k £186.29k £239.82k £239.00k £269.67k
Total expenditure £206.38k £196.07k £218.33k £248.06k £262.00k
Income from government contracts £60.00k £92.26k £60.00k N/A £60.00k
Income from government grants £33.08k £0 £34.29k £85.63k £24.93k