Financial history THE BUSOGA TRUST

Charity number: 288388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £666.52k £378.30k £601.83k £1.04m £996.48k
Total expenditure £495.93k £564.30k £552.55k £949.90k £1.10m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £590.61k N/A £508.24k £883.42k £900.11k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £64.08k N/A £85.61k £146.68k £91.36k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £54 N/A £313 £159 £204
Income - Other £11.78k N/A £7.68k £9.42k £4.82k
Income - Legacies £148.43k N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £477.20k N/A £534.34k £924.93k £1.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £18.73k N/A £18.22k £24.97k £25.56k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £10.42k £8.19k £8.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0