THE SEARLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 288541
Charity reporting is up to date (123 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 June 2021 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 08 June 2021 123 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 11 March 2019 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 23 December 2019 321 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 17 July 2018 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 17 July 2018 162 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 13 April 2017 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 13 April 2017 67 days late Download