Financial history CARE FOR LIMEHOUSE PARISH CHURCH (ST ANNE'S) COMMERCIAL ROAD TRUST (USUALLY KNOWN AS CARE FOR ST ANNE'S)

Charity number: 288889
Charity reporting is overdue by 73 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £7.08k £14.20k £34.77k £12.59k £15.00k
Total expenditure £0 £6.47k £16.36k £8.73k £10.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A