BASINGSTOKE AND DEANE UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 288956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £33.57k £15.78k £7.33k £16.13k £18.25k
Total expenditure £33.90k £13.45k £8.98k £17.48k £14.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A