BASINGSTOKE AND DEANE UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 288956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dennis Harlow Trustee 28 March 2017 None on record
Roger Stannard Trustee 22 February 2017 None on record
MARTIN STAINER Trustee 11 January 2014 None on record
Susan Dewey Trustee 11 January 2018 None on record
Jennifer Burford Trustee 14 May 2020 None on record
Christopher Dyer Trustee 24 February 2020 None on record
Kerri Picton-Robinson Trustee 01 February 2018 None on record