GUJARAT HINDU WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 289113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.49k £4.06k £7.44k £8.22k £4.76k
Total expenditure £11.01k £10.15k £10.90k £11.97k £12.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A