THE DAVENANT CENTRE

Charity number: 289235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £149.35k £206.98k £221.68k £239.45k £261.14k
Total expenditure £118.62k £99.38k £78.20k £148.81k £84.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A