Trustees THE FRIENDS OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CATHEDRAL OF EAST ANGLIA
Charity number: 289281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Ellis | Chair | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alan Peter Hodgson | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Lewins | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Pitt | Trustee | 24 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Lincoln | Trustee | 24 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Fox | Trustee | 19 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brian Reginald Dowler | Trustee | 10 March 2006 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.