THE JOHN RICE CHARITY

Charity number: 289926
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £14.45k £12.13k £14.50k £14.72k £15.14k
Total expenditure £14.69k £18.10k £16.59k £13.96k £10.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A