BOLTONS GARDEN ENCLOSURES

Charity number: 289951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Fletcher Trustee 08 October 2018 None on record
Lucinda Lindsay Trustee 16 November 2020 None on record
MICHELLE ANDREA YUE Trustee 25 June 2013 None on record
Dean Worrall Trustee 25 March 2019 None on record
Elizabeth Evans Trustee 25 November 2015 None on record
Bernadette Milner Trustee 25 March 2019 None on record
Priscila Lehto Trustee 13 May 2019 None on record