Financial history MARKFIELD BEAM ENGINE AND MUSEUM

Charity number: 290486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.28k £4.72k £13.83k £6.62k £32.91k
Total expenditure £11.63k £2.28k £5.94k £9.57k £5.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.50k N/A £25.00k