FRIENDS OF ST STEPHEN'S CHURCH, UP NATELY

Charity number: 290530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.89k £4.26k £1.81k £3.45k £1.05k
Total expenditure £962 £2.06k £11.67k £5.47k £651
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A