Financial history THE GREAT BRITAIN SASAKAWA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 290766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.31m £967.93k £969.77k £11.80m £1.45m
Total expenditure £1.52m £1.32m £1.27m £1.18m £884.12k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £11.12m £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £703.80k £305.00k £310.00k £370.35k £330.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £11.12m £0
Income - Investment £607.22k £662.93k £659.77k £312.12k £1.12m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.40m £1.15m £1.10m £1.02m £790.46k
Expenditure - Raising funds £118.17k £174.57k £165.13k £158.50k £93.66k
Expenditure - Governance £93.90k £84.52k £107.99k £96.70k £83.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.19m £928.98k £850.61k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £118.17k £0 £165.13k £158.50k £93.66k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0