THE LONDON MOZART PLAYERS TRUST

Charity number: 290833
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 July 2021 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 July 2021 90 days late Download
Annual return 30 July 2019 28 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2019 28 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 July 2018 28 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2018 28 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 July 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2017 30 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 July 2016 30 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2016 30 May 2017 On time Download