THE LONDON MOZART PLAYERS TRUST

Charity number: 290833
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/07/2016 30/07/2017 30/07/2018 30/07/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £248.53k £157.08k £325.55k £607.34k £432.57k
Total expenditure £206.56k £77.34k £194.16k £412.01k £479.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £13.50k £10.00k £34.01k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £606.10k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £1.24k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £326.08k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £412.01k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £1.43k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £400.00k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A