Dogfen lywodraethu APT ACTION ON POVERTY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 DEC 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 APR 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 MAR 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 APR 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND IN PARTICULAR TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES WHO ARE POOR BY REASON OF BEING UNABLE TO EARN THEIR LIVING, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GENERAL AND TECHNICAL ADVICE ON THE ESTABLISHMENT (INCLUDING THE OPERATION) OF BUSINESS AND NON-PROFIT ENTERPRISES, THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RE-TRAINING IN THE SKILLS REQUIRED FOR EMPLOYMENT AND SELF EMPLOYMENT , THE PROVISION OF RAW MATERIALS AND OTHER GOODS, AND THROUGH THE DESIGN AND DEVELOPMENT OF MACHINERY AND EQUIPMENT APPROPRIATE FOR USE IN AREAS OF NEED, AND THE PROMOTION OF SUCH DESIGNS, BY ALL SUITABLE MEANS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.