SOUTH WEST NORFOLK DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 290911
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £20.53k £25.59k £17.89k £23.53k £17.38k
Total expenditure £27.20k £18.01k £22.22k £30.90k £23.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A