Accounts and annual returns NORTH PETHERTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 291048
Charity reporting is overdue by 175 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 175 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window