Financial history MRS MARY OLIVIA SAFFERY TURNER FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 291059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.20k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £6.41k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A