THE POLONSKY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 291143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £939.57k £424.98k £1.28m £441.97k £399.84k
Total expenditure £4.54m £4.65m £4.27m £3.53m £2.15m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £736.88k N/A £636.03k N/A N/A
Income - Other £202.68k N/A £648.84k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.54m N/A £4.27m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £146.09k N/A £117.68k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £4.40m N/A £4.15m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A