Accounts and annual returns PULFORD SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 291429
Charity reporting is up to date (120 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 October 2023 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 October 2023 | 485 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 12 January 2020 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window