Trustees OXFORDSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 291693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip James Earl Chair 11 September 2021
None on record
Martin Richards Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Andrew Hindle Trustee 11 September 2021
None on record
Marcus John Goodwin Trustee 11 September 2021
None on record
Alexander James Warren Wynne Trustee 11 September 2021
4TH OXFORD SCOUT GROUP
Overdue by 24 days
Katharine Mary Murkett Trustee 11 September 2021
None on record
Wendy Louise Tatham Trustee 13 July 2019
None on record
George Ryall Trustee 13 July 2019
None on record
Kirsten Michaela Phipps Get Trustee 19 September 2017
None on record
SARAH LOUISE JOYNER Trustee 15 July 2015
None on record
JOHN CLIVE CECIL MAY OBE DL Trustee 19 December 2013
THE MARINE SOCIETY AND SEA CADETS
Received: On time