Governing document CHOICES
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 APR 1986 AS AMENDED ON 18 OCT 1994 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUN 1997 AS AMENDED ON 30 SEP 2009 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAR 2017 as amended on 04 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF CHOICES IS TO RELIEVE MENTAL DISTRESS, EXPERIENCED BY ADULTS IN THE CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND PETERBOROUGH AREA, AS A RESULT OF BEING SEXUALLY ABUSED AS CHILDREN; IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF SPECIALISED COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.