Accounts and annual returns BRITISH VENDEEN SHEEP SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 292197
Charity reporting is overdue by 446 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 80 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 80 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 Overdue Overdue by 446 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Overdue Overdue by 446 days
Annual return 31 May 2021 12 April 2022 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 11 April 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 11 April 2021 376 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required