Trustees DOWNLEY EVENING WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 292329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diana Lawson | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Miller | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Alderman | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara McKnight | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Cork | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Byrne | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heather Read | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pat Gatcum | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Morris | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nina Kelly | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANET PATCH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.